(BK) In Re: Rizal Juco Guevarra
Plaintiff: Rizal Juco Guevarra
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac) and Douglas M. Whatley
Case Number: 2:2020cv01187
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/2/2020: Appellant elected to have the appeal heard by the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. However, the Appeal was erroneously transmitted to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the #1 Bankruptcy Appeal is TRANSFERRED to the Bankruptcy Appellate Panel. CASE CLOSED. (cc BAP, BK Judge Jaime, Chief Judge Sargis) (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 OPENING LETTER in BANKRUPTCY APPEAL in re Debtor: *Rizal Juco Guevarra*, Appellant: *Rizal Juco Guevarra*, Appellee: *Douglas M. Whatley*, USBC #: *1825306 B 7*, ADV #: *-*, BAP #: *-*, Bankruptcy Judge: *Christopher D. Jaime*; (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Becknal, R)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, Bankruptcy Court case number 18-25306-B-7 by Rizal Juco Guevarra. 30-Day Filing Deadline for Bankruptcy Certificate of Record due by 7/20/2020.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (BK) In Re: Rizal Juco Guevarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rizal Juco Guevarra
Represented By: Mark Julian Hannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Douglas M. Whatley
Represented By: Barry H. Spitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?