Payne et al v. ABB, Inc., et al.,
Plaintiff: Susan Payne and Dennis C. Payne
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, ABB, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., American Compressor Company, General Electric Company, Tate Andale, Inc., Viad Corp, ViacomCBS Inc., York International Corporation, Crane Co., Carrier Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. sued individually and as successor-ininterest to Davis Engineering Company formerly known as Aqua-Chem Inc. Doing business as Cleaverbrook Division, Viacom Inc., Rockwell International, Tremco Machine Works, Inc., Aqua-Chem Inc., Tate Tremco, Inc., CBS Corporation and Goulds Pumps, Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01198
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Andrew Lon Seitz on behalf of Dennis C. Payne, Susan Payne. Attorney Seitz, Andrew Lon added. (Seitz, Andrew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Carpenter on behalf of Viad Corp. Attorney Carpenter, Elizabeth J. added. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. Attorney Sharp, Andrew Livingston added.(Sharp, Andrew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole)
July 23, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Viad Corp.(Langbord, Peter)
July 23, 2020 Filing 50 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 49 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Goulds Pumps, Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 48 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by York International Corporation. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Crane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey)
July 22, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Crane Co.. Attorney Davis, Geoffrey Marc added.(Davis, Geoffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Anjali T. Nagpal on behalf of Tate Andale, Inc.. Attorney Nagpal, Anjali T. added. (Nagpal, Anjali)
July 16, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Anselmo, Emily Elizabeth added. (Anselmo, Emily)
July 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine P. Gardiner on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Gardiner, Katherine P. added. (Gardiner, Katherine)
July 16, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles Todd Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Sheldon, Charles Todd added. (Sheldon, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek)
July 16, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by General Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek)
July 16, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Johnson, Derek)
July 16, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Derek Spencer Johnson on behalf of General Electric Company. Attorney Johnson, Derek Spencer added. (Johnson, Derek)
July 16, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC re #35 Answer to Complaint. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles S. Park on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC. Attorney Park, Charles S. added. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation re #29 Answer to Complaint. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation re #29 Answer to Complaint. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charles S. Park on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Attorney Park, Charles S. added. (Park, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant York International Corporation. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Marisa R. Chaves on behalf of York International Corporation. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER by York International Corporation. Attorney Chaves, Marisa R. added.(Chaves, Marisa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER with Jury Demand by ViacomCBS Inc..(Empting, Erin)
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Tate Andale, Inc.. (Sabnis, Rohit)
July 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rohit Sabnis on behalf of Tate Andale, Inc.. (Sabnis, Rohit)
July 15, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Tate Andale, Inc.. Attorney Sabnis, Rohit added.(Sabnis, Rohit)
July 15, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. Attorney Gage, Nicole Elisabet added.(Gage, Nicole)
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Marisa R. Chaves on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc.. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Attorney Chaves, Marisa R. added.(Chaves, Marisa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Goulds Pumps, Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Marisa R. Chaves on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC. (Chaves, Marisa)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER by Goulds Pumps, Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC. Attorney Chaves, Marisa R. added.(Chaves, Marisa)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc.. Attorney Jamison, Kevin D. added. (Jamison, Kevin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant ViacomCBS Inc. (Empting, Erin)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Erin Nicole Empting on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc. Attorney Empting, Erin Nicole added. (Empting, Erin)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Margaret I. Johnson on behalf of Viad Corp. Attorney Johnson, Margaret I. added. (Johnson, Margaret)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Viad Corp. (Langbord, Peter)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter B. Langbord on behalf of Viad Corp. (Langbord, Peter)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Viad Corp. Attorney Langbord, Peter B. added.(Langbord, Peter)
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Johnson Controls, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Tate Andale, Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Viad Corp, York International Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott L. Frost* *Frost Law Firm, PC* *273 West 7th Street* *San Pedro, CA 90731*. (Benson, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *ABB, Inc., American Compressor Company, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott L. Frost* *Frost Law Firm, PC* *273 West 7th Street* *San Pedro, CA 90731*. (Benson, A.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dennis C Payne, Susan Payne (Frost, Scott)
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Susan Payne, Dennis C. Payne. Attorney Frost, Scott L. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8941169) (Frost, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne et al v. ABB, Inc., et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Marisa R. Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Edward Roger Hugo
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Compressor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Charles Todd Sheldon
Represented By: Katherine P. Gardiner
Represented By: Derek Spencer Johnson
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Andale, Inc.
Represented By: Anjali T. Nagpal
Represented By: Rohit Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corp
Represented By: Margaret I. Johnson
Represented By: Peter B. Langbord
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Marisa R. Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey Marc Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. sued individually and as successor-ininterest to Davis Engineering Company formerly known as Aqua-Chem Inc. Doing business as Cleaverbrook Division
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell International
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremco Machine Works, Inc.
Represented By: Anjali T. Nagpal
Represented By: Rohit Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua-Chem Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Livingston Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Tremco, Inc.
Represented By: Anjali T. Nagpal
Represented By: Rohit Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Erin Nicole Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Marisa R. Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Payne
Represented By: Scott L. Frost
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis C. Payne
Represented By: Scott L. Frost
Represented By: Andrew Lon Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?