Rodriguez v. Allen Distribution, LP et al
Plaintiff: Jobany Rodriguez
Defendant: Allen Distribution, LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01202
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/12/2020 EXTENDING Defendant Allen Distribution, LP's time to respond to #1 Complaint to 8/31/2020. (Huang, H)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Allen Distribution, LP. (Golper, Matthew) Modified on 8/11/2020 (Huang, H).
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/29/2020. Added attorney Micah T. Saul, PHV for Allen Distribution, LP. (Huang, H)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Allen Distribution, LP for attorney Micah T. Saul, Esq to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9021951) (Attachments: #1 ertificate of Good Standing)(Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/28/2020 (York, M).
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/20/2020. Added attorney Andrew L. Levy, PHV for Allen Distribution, LP. (Coll, A)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Allen Distribution, LP for attorney Andrew L. Levy to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-8995601) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (York, M).
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Allen Distribution, LP. (Golper, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to 8/11/2020, to Respond to #1 Complaint by Allen Distribution, LP. Attorney Golper, Matthew added. (Golper, Matthew) Modified on 7/14/2020 (York, M).
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Allen Distribution, LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert Joshua Wasserman* *Mayall Hurley, PC* *2453 Grand Canal Blvd.* *Stockton, CA 95207*. (Benson, A.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jobany Rodriguez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8942855) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wasserman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Allen Distribution, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jobany Rodriguez
Represented By: Robert Joshua Wasserman
Represented By: Jenny Dione Baysinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Distribution, LP
Represented By: Micah T. Saul, PHV
Represented By: Matthew Golper
Represented By: Andrew L. Levy, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?