Braiser v. Valdez Painting, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Shaun Brasier
Defendant: Valdez Painting, Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01223
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to #7 Opposition to Motion by Shaun Brasier. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Khosrowshahi, Arash) Modified on 8/10/2020 (Huang, H).
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Plaintiff's Motion to Remand/Motion for Attorneys' Fees, ECF No. #5 , is SUBMITTED without oral argument. The motion is submitted on the briefs, including the reply brief, if any, as provided by Local Rule 230(d). Accordingly, the Motion Hearing date of 8/4/2020 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 8/14/2020 is RESET for 9/24/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of an updated joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Valdez Painting, Incorporated. (Ruggles, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities By Valdez Painting, Incorporated in OPPOSITION to #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vaughn Gino Valdez, #2 Declaration of Matthew J. Ruggles, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Ruggles, Matthew) Modified on 8/3/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 10/22/2020 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. [Text Only Entry] (Michel, G.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND and for ATTORNEYS FEES by Shaun Brasier. Attorney Khosrowshahi, Arash Sajed added. Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Arash Khosrowshahi, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Khosrowshahi, Arash) Modified on 7/22/2020 (Coll, A).
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Valdez Painting, Incorporated. (Ruggles, Matthew)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Valdez Painting, Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Ruggles, Matthew)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00272761 by Valdez Painting, Incorporated. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8946506) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vaughn Gino Valdez, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruggles, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braiser v. Valdez Painting, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valdez Painting, Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Jeremy Ruggles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Brasier
Represented By: Joshua S. Falakassa
Represented By: Arash S. Khosrowshahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?