Hernandez Pablo et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Plaintiff: Hilario Jeronimo Chales and Santos Hernandez Pablo
Defendant: Elisabeth M. Clerie, Ken Cuccinelli and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 2:2020cv01336
Filed: July 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 PROCESS RECEIPT RETURNED EXECUTED: Elisabeth M. Clerie served on 7/27/2020; Ken Cuccinelli served on 7/23/2020; Chad F. Wolf served on 7/23/2020. (Reader, L)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Elisabeth M. Clerie,Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT for Ken Cuccinelli (Hemesath, Audrey)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Santos Hernandez Pablo, Hilario Jeronimo Chales pursuant to order of the court. (Jagannath, Gautam)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: On July 7, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ECF No. 2. Plaintiff has submitted the affidavit required under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), which demonstrates that Plaintiff is unable to pay fees or security. Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is therefore GRANTED. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and file a statement with the court. The documents submitted should contain enough copies for each defendant and include the complaint, summons, new case documents, USM-285 and this minute order. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 60 days from the date of this order.IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Abraham, Emily)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Emily Anne Abraham on behalf of Santos Hernandez Pablo, Hilario Jeronimo Chales. Attorney Abraham, Emily Anne added. (Abraham, Emily)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Elisabeth M. Clerie, Ken Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gautam Jagannath* *Social Justice Collaborative* *1832 Second Street* *Berkeley, CA 94710*. (Donati, J)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: On July 7, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ECF No. 2. Plaintiff has submitted the affidavit required under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), which demonstrates that Plaintiff is unable to pay fees or security. Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is therefore GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 6, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.)
July 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Santos Hernandez Pablo. (Jagannath, Gautam)
July 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Santos Hernandez Pablo, Hilario Jeronimo Chales. Attorney Jagannath, Gautam J. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)(Jagannath, Gautam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez Pablo et al v. Cuccinelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisabeth M. Clerie
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilario Jeronimo Chales
Represented By: Gautam J. Jagannath
Represented By: Emily Anne Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Hernandez Pablo
Represented By: Gautam J. Jagannath
Represented By: Emily Anne Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?