(PC) Schmaus v. Covello, et al.
Plaintiff: Jason Erik Schmaus
Defendant: P. Covello, Christopher Smith, Bal, S. Gates, Vaughn and Wong
Case Number: 2:2020cv01356
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/28/2020 GRANTING #6 Motion for Extended Time. Plaintiff is granted up to an including 10/7/2020 within which to file his consent or decline to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (Henshaw, R)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Jason Erik Schmaus. (Henshaw, R)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Jason Erik Schmaus. (York, M)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jason Erik Schmaus. (Huang, H)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/6/2020. New Case Number 1:20-cv-01356-AC; Old Case Number 1:20-cv-00922-SAB. (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Transfer Order re-served on Jason Erik Schmaus with complete CDCR No. H-65695. (Yin, K)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order served on Jason Erik Schmaus. (Marrujo, C)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jason Erik Schmaus, CDCR# H-65695 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jason Erik Schmaus. (Lundstrom, T)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Bal, P. Covello, S. Gates, Christopher Smith, Vaughn, Wong by Jason Erik Schmaus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Schmaus v. Covello, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Erik Schmaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?