Keopadubsy v. Siemens Mobility
Plaintiff: Khamkoth Keopadubsy
Defendant: Siemens Mobility, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01412
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/31/2021 CONTINUING the Discovery cut-off date from 11/6/2021 to 3/7/2022. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off by Khamkoth Keopadubsy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tulyathan, Kwanporn)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED Protective Order Re Confidential Designation by Siemens Mobility, Inc. (Shadi, Sabrina)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/5/2021 ORDERING Discovery EXTENDED to 11/6/2021.(Reader, L)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Discovery Cut-Off by Khamkoth Keopadubsy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Larry)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Larry W. Lee on behalf of Khamkoth Keopadubsy. Attorney Lee, Larry W. added. (Lee, Larry)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Khamkoth Keopadubsy. (Tulyathan, Kwanporn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Siemens Mobility, Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Norfleet, Carter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sabrina Layne Shadi on behalf of Siemens Mobility, Inc.. Attorney Shadi, Sabrina Layne added. (Shadi, Sabrina)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nicholas D. Poper on behalf of Siemens Mobility, Inc.. Attorney Poper, Nicholas D. added. (Poper, Nicholas)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Siemens Mobility, Inc.. (Norfleet, Carter)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00278580 by Siemens Mobility, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8992028)(Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norfleet, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keopadubsy v. Siemens Mobility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Mobility, Inc.
Represented By: Carter Lee Norfleet
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Represented By: Nicholas D. Poper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khamkoth Keopadubsy
Represented By: Kwanporn Tulyathan
Represented By: Larry W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?