McGhee v. Synchrony Bank
Plaintiff: April McGhee
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv01434
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER by Synchrony Bank.(Warner, Steven)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/25/2020 GRANTING #4 Stipulation and Proposed Order, GRANTING Synchrony until 9/10/2020 to respond to the #1 Complaint.(Coll, A)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant Synchrony Bank to Respond to #1 Complaint by Synchrony Bank. Attorney Warner, Steven P. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Warner, Steven) Modified on 8/25/2020 (Huang, H).
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Synchrony Bank* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lee Paul Mankin, IV* *The Law Office of L. Paul Mankin* *4655 Cass Street, Suite 410* *San Diego, CA 92109*. (Benson, A.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Synchrony Bank by April McGhee. Attorney Mankin, Lee Paul added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8998738) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mankin, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGhee v. Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April McGhee
Represented By: Lee Paul Mankin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Represented By: Steven P. Warner
Represented By: Zachary C. Frampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?