(PC) Price v. Igbal et al
Plaintiff: Immanuel Christian Price
Defendant: Z Igbal, A Kehinde, S. Gates and K Rueter
Case Number: 2:2020cv01439
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for COPIES by Immanuel Christian Price. (Coll, A) (Response sent: "The Clerk's Office will provide copies of documents and of the docketsheet at $0.50 per page. The complaint with exhibits is 41 pages.") Modified on 8/5/2020 (Henshaw, R).
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Immanuel Christian Price. (Kaminski, H)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Immanuel Christian Price, CDC G-51247 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
July 20, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Immanuel Christian Price. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Immanuel Christian Price re #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Immanuel Christian Price. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against S. Gates, Z Igbal, A Kehinde, K Rueter by Immanuel Christian Price.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Price v. Igbal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Igbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Kehinde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Rueter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immanuel Christian Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?