(HC) Johnson v. Unknown
Petitioner: Anthony Johnson
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2020cv01443
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Reader, L)
July 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 order, petition for writ of habeas corpus and application to proceed in forma pauperis served on Anthony Johnson. (Becknal, R)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/29/2020 DENYING Petitioner's motion for extended time #1 , without prejudice. Petitioner shall, within thirty (30) days after service of this order: file a petition for writ of habeas corpus on the form provided herewith that bears the docket number assigned this case; and submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided herewith, OR pay the $5.00 filing fee, Failure of petitioner to timely comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this matter be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send petitioner, together with a copy of his order, a blank petition for writ of habeas corpus and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis used by prisoners in this district.(Becknal, R)
July 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file a habeas corpus case by Anthony Johnson. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Johnson v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?