(PS) Murphy v. Geico Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Shannon O. Murphy, Esq., Sr. Doing business as Sheetmetal & Associates and Shannon O. Murphy, Sr. Doing business as Sheetmetal & Associates
Defendant: Geico Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01455
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Service Order, #7 One Summons, #8 Civil New Case Documents, and One USM-285 form served on Shannon O. Murphy Sr. (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Geico Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shannon O. Murphy, Sr.* *2 Marina Blvd.* *Suite #15-B5* *Pittsburg, CA 94565*. (Becknal, R)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/2020 WITHDRAWING the initial scheduling order (ECF No. #5 ), and DISREGARDING court's previous instructions re service; DIRECTING the Clerk to issue process. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM the necessary documents and within 10 days thereafter file a statement with the court. The USM is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs within 90 days from the date of receipt of service documents. Failure to comply with this order may result in any appropriate sanctions, including monetary sanctions and/or dismissal of the action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). (Becknal, R)
July 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Summons and #5 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Shannon O. Murphy, Esq. Sr. (Donati, J)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Donati, J)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Geico Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shannon O. Murphy* *2 Marina Blvd., Suite 15-B5* *Pittsburg, CA 94565*. (Donati, J)
July 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 3 Minute Order served on Shannon O. Murphy, Esq. Sr.. (Donati, J)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: On July 20, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ECF No. 2. Plaintiff has submitted the affidavit required under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1), which demonstrates that Plaintiff is unable to pay fees or security. Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is therefore GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
July 21, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Tupolo, A)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Shannon O. Murphy. (Tupolo, A)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geico Insurance Company by Shannon O. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Murphy v. Geico Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon O. Murphy, Esq., Sr. Doing business as Sheetmetal & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon O. Murphy, Sr. Doing business as Sheetmetal & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?