(PS) Aussieker et al v. Police Lives Matter
Plaintiff: Mark Aussieker and Kimberly Aussieker
Defendant: Police Lives Matter Doing business as American for Police and Trooper Safety
Case Number: 2:2020cv01458
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL by Police Lives Matter. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Treuden, Daniel) Modified on 7/31/2020 (Zignago, K.).
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Police Lives Matter re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Treuden, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, Small Claims Division, case number 20SC01053 by Police Lives Matter. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9004537) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Treuden, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Aussieker et al v. Police Lives Matter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Aussieker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Aussieker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Lives Matter Doing business as American for Police and Trooper Safety
Represented By: Daniel James Treuden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?