Brooks v. Giorgio Armani Corp.
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Defendant: Giorgio Armani Corporation Doing business as Armani Exchange
Case Number: 2:2020cv01483
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/11/2020 EXTENDING Time to 10/16/2020, for Defendant to Respond to #1 Complaint. (York, M)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Giorgio Armani Corporation. Attorney Daugherty, Thomas E added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Daugherty, Thomas) Modified on 9/14/2020 (Coll, A).
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Giorgio Armani Corporation served on 8/28/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. (Coelho, Thiago)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Giorgio Armani Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Thiago Merlini Coelho* *Wilshire Law Firm* *3055 Wilshire Blvd., 12th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90010*. (Benson, A.)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Giorgio Armani Corporation by Valerie Brooks. Attorney Coelho, Thiago Merlini added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9011637) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coelho, Thiago)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Giorgio Armani Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Brooks
Represented By: Thiago Merlini Coelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giorgio Armani Corporation Doing business as Armani Exchange
Represented By: Thomas E Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?