(HC) Reid v. Sherman
Petitioner: Carlton L. Reid
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 2:2020cv01596
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE and Update by Carlton L. Reid re #11 Order on Motion for Extension. (Reader, L)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1596 KJM GGH (HC). (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Carlton L. Reid. (Plummer, M)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hokans, Julie)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/22/20 GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file additional evidence, if relevant to petitioners habeas petition, provided by the state court in support of his petition within 30 days from the date of this order. Respondents response to the habeas petition as set forth in the courts August 14, 2020 order will be extended to 30 days after the filing of petitioners supplemental evidence, to provide for a response, if any, to petitioners filing of additional evidence. (Plummer, M)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/22/20 ORDERING petitioner shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a signed affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Plummer, M)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion for Extension,, served on Carlton L. Reid. (Plummer, M)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Carlton L. Reid. (Plummer, M)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Carlton L. Reid. (Huang, H)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME by Carlton L. Reid. (Zignago, K.)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (Henshaw, R)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/17/2020. Consent or Decline due by 9/21/2020. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/14/2020 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee and DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Supervising Deputy Attorney General) (Henshaw, R)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on Carlton L. Reid. (Henshaw, R)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 EXHIBITS Re: Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 by Carlton L. Reid. (Reader, L)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Carlton L. Reid. (Benson, A.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Stu Sherman by Carlton L. Reid. (Attachments: #1 part 2 of 2)(Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Reid v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlton L. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Represented By: Julie Anne Hokans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?