Naiman v. Valuecap Lenders LLC
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman and Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.
Defendant: Valuecap Lenders LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01603
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 CASE CLOSED (text only entry): pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (Coll, A)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc., Sidney Naiman. (Friedman, Todd)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Friedman, Todd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sidney Naiman.(Friedman, Todd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Valuecap Lenders LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Benson, A.)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sidney Naiman. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9047578) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naiman v. Valuecap Lenders LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing Inc.
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valuecap Lenders LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?