Castrejon v. Westrock Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Humberto Castrejon, Jr.
Defendant: Westrock Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01609
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 OTHER COURT CASE NUMBER from California Northern District case number 3:20-cv-06162. (Gonzalez, R)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/1/2020 TRANSFERRING CASE to USDC, Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Transfer Venue by Westrock Services, LLC. (Jang, Scott)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Isam Charles Khoury on behalf of Humberto Castrejon, Jr. Attorney Khoury, Isam Charles added. (Khoury, Isam)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael D. Singer on behalf of Humberto Castrejon, Jr. Attorney Singer, Michael D. added. (Singer, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Westrock Services, LLC re #4 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Shin, Isabella)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Westrock Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Attorney Shin, Isabella L. added. (Shin, Isabella)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Westrock Services, LLC. (Jang, Scott)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00279027 by Westrock Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9049523)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration Colucci, #4 Declaration Maxwell)(Jang, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castrejon v. Westrock Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westrock Services, LLC
Represented By: Isabella L. Shin
Represented By: Scott Philip Jang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humberto Castrejon, Jr.
Represented By: Kristina De La Rosa
Represented By: Michael D. Singer
Represented By: Isam Charles Khoury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?