(PC) Wilkins v. Heslop et al
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins
Defendant: S. Heslop, A. Sawma, L. Eldridge and B. Velasquez
Case Number: 2:2020cv01622
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/1/2020 ORDERING Clerk to update the docket to reflect Plaintiff wishes to withdraw #7 Objection to Removal and Motion to Remand. (Henshaw, R)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Keenan Wilkins. (Henshaw, R)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of WITHDRAWL of #7 Opposition to Removal by Keenan Wilkins. (Coll, A)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPPOSITION by B. Velasquez to #7 Motion to Remand. (Miller, Byron)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 [WITHDRAWN PER #9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL] OBJECTION to #1 Removal and MOTION to REMAND by Keenan Wilkins. (York, M) Modified on 10/2/2020 (Henshaw, R).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-01622-KJM-DB. (York, M)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Keenan Wilkins. (York, M)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (York, M)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal (28 U.S.C. 1446(D) by B. Velasquez. (Miller, Byron)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Benson, A.)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by B. Velasquez (Miller, Byron)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UCR-2020-5107 by B. Velasquez. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9052806) (Miller, Byron)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Keenan Wilkins. (Benson, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilkins v. Heslop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Heslop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sawma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Velasquez
Represented By: Byron M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?