(PS) Lull v. County of Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lull and Autotek, Inc.
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Robert Logsdon, Ben Green, Lori Moss, June Powells-Mays, Robin Rasmussen, Leighann Moffitt, Paul Munoz, Tammy Derby, Scott Purvis, Wayne Eastman, Bob Ivie and Brian Washko
Case Number: 2:2020cv01645
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by County of Sacramento, et al., Tammy . Motion Hearing SET for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Wendy Motooka, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Motooka, Wendy) Modified on 10/5/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 30, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Related Case Order, #6 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Christopher Lull. (Huang, H)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/30/2020 ORDERING that this case be related to case numbers 2:16-cv-1093-KJM-CKD, 2:20-cv-0165-KJM-CKD (PS), 2:20-cv-1646-JAM-CKD (PS), and that the related cases be reassigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:20-cv-1645-KJM-CKD (PS). (Huang, H) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Huang, H).
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:16-cv-01093-KJM CKD, 2:20-cv-00165-KJM-CKD PS, 2:20-cv-01646-JAM-CKD PS by County of Sacramento, Tammy Derby, Wayne Eastman, Bob Ivie, Leighann Moffitt, Paul Munoz, June Powells-Mays, Scott Purvis, Robin Rasmussen. Attorney Motooka, Wendy M. added. (Motooka, Wendy)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Christopher Lull. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 1/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Summons, served on Christopher Lull. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento, Tammy Derby, Wayne Eastman, Ben Green, Bob Ivie, Robert Logsdon, Leighann Moffitt, Lori Moss, Paul Munoz, June Powells-Mays, Scott Purvis, Robin Rasmussen, Brian Washko* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christopher Lull* *8633 Antelope North Road* *Antelope, CA 95843*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 18, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200108389 $400.00 by Christopher Lull on 8/18/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Sacramento, Tammy Derby, Wayne Eastman, Ben Green, Bob Ivie, Robert Logsdon, Leighann Moffitt, Lori Moss, Paul Munoz, June Powells-Mays, Scott Purvis, Robin Rasmussen, Brian Washko by Christopher Lull. #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Mena-Sanchez, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Lull v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Logsdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Powells-Mays
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Rasmussen
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leighann Moffitt
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Munoz
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Derby
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Purvis
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Eastman
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ivie
Represented By: Wendy M. Motooka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Washko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autotek, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?