Castanon et al v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Castanon and John Duron
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc. and WinCo Holdings, Inc. An Idaho Corporation Doing business as Winco Foods
Case Number: 2:2020cv01656
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Esmeralda Castanon to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Hawkins, James)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/29/2020 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #8 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum , #2 Proposed Order )(Kwan, Sophia) Modified on 9/30/2020 (Tupolo, A). Mo
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against WinCo Holdings, Inc. by Esmeralda Castanon, John Duron. (Hawkins, James) Modified on 9/15/2020 (Huang, H).
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 is noticed for an unavailable hearing date. Accordingly, and on the Courts own motion, the 9/24/2020 motion hearing is VACATED and RESET on 10/1/2020 and is also SUBMITTED pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the 10/1/2020 motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. For future filings, counsel is directed to find available civil law and motion calendar dates on the Court's website at www.caed.uscourts.gov by following these menu items: Judges, All Judges, United States District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (MCE), Standard Information (under the Case Management Procedures). Reservation of a hearing date is not required and all civil motions are at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 7. (Deutsch, S)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE by WinCo Holdings, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Kwan, Sophia) Modified on 8/25/2020 (Reader, L).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by WinCo Holdings, Inc. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for MCE, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Kwan, Sophia)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
August 17, 2020 RECEIPT number 0972-9059467, Kwan, Sophia 2020-08-17 18:05:45 Notice of Removal (2:20-at-00818) CreditCard 0972-9059467 $ 400.00. (Becknal, R)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Kwan, Sophia)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior, case number 34-2020-00278994 by WinCo Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Renae Gaskill)(Kwan, Sophia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castanon et al v. WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esmeralda Castanon
Represented By: James Ross Hawkins
Represented By: Christina M. Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duron
Represented By: James Ross Hawkins
Represented By: Christina M. Lucio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Sophia Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WinCo Holdings, Inc. An Idaho Corporation Doing business as Winco Foods
Represented By: Sophia Kwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?