(PC) Wilhelm v. Aung et al
Plaintiff: Steve Wilhelm
Defendant: W. Vaughn, Sandar Rung and Sandar Aung
Case Number: 2:2020cv01682
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #2 Motion to Proceed IFP served on CDCR. (Henshaw, R)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/30/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Steve Wilhelm. Plaintiff to pay the statutory filing fee of $350. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Steve Wilhelm. (Henshaw, R)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/8/2020 DENYING as unnecessary #4 Motion to Correct Defendant's Name. (Henshaw, R)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order served on Steve Wilhelm. (Henshaw, R)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to CORRECT Defendant's name by Steve Wilhelm. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/21/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kastilahn, A)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Steve Wilhelm. (Kastilahn, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steve Wilhelm. (Kastilahn, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Steve Wilhelm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Wilhelm v. Aung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandar Rung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandar Aung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?