California Coastkeeper Alliance v. Cosumnes Corporation
Plaintiff: California Coastkeeper Alliance
Defendant: Cosumnes Corporation Doing business as Murieta Equestrian Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv01703
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Cosumnes Corporation served on 10/7/2020. (Flanders, Jason) Modified on 10/8/2020 (Kaminski, H).
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flanders, Jason)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cosumnes Corporation by California Coastkeeper Alliance.(Flanders, Jason)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Cosumnes Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Erica A. Maharg* *Aqua Terra Aeris (ATA) Law Group* *4030 Martin Luther King Jr. Way* *Oakland, CA 94609*. (Benson, A.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cosumnes Corporation by California Coastkeeper Alliance. Attorney Maharg, Erica A. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9076737) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOV, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maharg, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Coastkeeper Alliance v. Cosumnes Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosumnes Corporation Doing business as Murieta Equestrian Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Coastkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Erica A. Maharg
Represented By: Jason Flanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?