(PS) Huang v. Sapia Networks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Sapia Networks, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01706
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 14 Case Closed served on Xiaohua Huang. (Huang, H)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 CASE CLOSED (text only entry): Pursuant to 13 Minute Order this case is CLOSED. (Huang, H)
October 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Minute Order served on Xiaohua Huang. (Van Dine, B)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ONLY) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/15/2020. Pursuant to plaintiff's re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal this action is closed. (Van Dine, B)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of DISMISSAL by Xiaohua Huang. (Huang, H)
October 7, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion served on Xiaohua Huang. (Coll, A)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/6/2020 GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time, GRANTING defendant 28 days from the date of this order to file a responsive pleading. (Coll, A)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to time extension and argument on the effective of service by Xiaohua Huang. (Kastilahn, A)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by Sapia Networks, Inc. to #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Kirkman, Douglas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kirkman, Douglas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Sapia Networks, Inc.. (Kirkman, Douglas)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to File Answer by Sapia Networks, Inc.. Attorney Kirkman, Douglas Earl added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirkman, Douglas) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Kaminski, H).
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sapia Networks, Inc. served on 9/3/2020. (Kaminski, H)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for permission for electronic filing by Xiaohua Huang. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 27, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Patent New Case Documents, #2 Summons served on Xiaohua Huang. (Donati, J)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* 6,999,331 * * 2/14/2006 * * Xiaohua Huang * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report) (Donati, J)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sapia Networks, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Xiaohua Huang* *P.O. Box 1639* *Los Gatos, CA 95031*. (Kastilahn, A)
August 27, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200108522 $400.00 fbo Xiaohua Huang by Xiaohua Huang on 8/27/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sapia Networks, Inc., by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kastilahn, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Huang v. Sapia Networks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapia Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas Earl Kirkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?