(PC) Brown v. Reilly et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Cherokee Brown
Defendant: G. Phillips, A. Reilly, R. Hood, T. Dina and D. Gonzales
Case Number: 2:2020cv01709
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to COMPEL a Settlement Agreement by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REQUEST for a quick response on grievance of submission by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Ronnie Cherokee Brown (Reader, L)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Kaminski, H)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of submission of grievance by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Zignago, K.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Zignago, K.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Zignago, K.)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Huang, H)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GRIEVANCE in support of #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Huang, H)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Huang, H)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/28/2020 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this Order, a properly completed application to proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. (Henshaw, R)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order and IFP application served on Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Henshaw, R)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Ronnie Cherokee Brown, CDC P-17249 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *8/26/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Coll, A)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Coll, A)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Coll, A)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ronnie Cherokee Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Brown v. Reilly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Dina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Cherokee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?