(PS)Huang v. Genesis Global Hardware, Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Genesis Global Hardware, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01713
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Genesis Global Hardware, Inc. re #8 MOTION to DISMISS. (Jereige, Amanda)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Genesis Global Hardware, Inc. Motion Hearing SET for 11/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jereige, Amanda)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amanda Jereige on behalf of Genesis Global Hardware, Inc.. Attorney Jereige, Amanda added. (Jereige, Amanda)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Genesis Global Hardware, Inc., served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
September 11, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Xiaohua Huang. (Huang, H)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/10/2020 DENYING #4 Motion for Electronic Case Filing. (Huang, H)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for ELECTRONIC FILING by Xiaohua Huang. (Coll, A)
August 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons served on Xiaohua Huang. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 28, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Patent New Case Documents for JAM, served on Xiaohua Huang. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Genesis Global Hardware, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Xiaohua Huang* *P.O. Box 1639* *Los Gatos, CA 95031*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* 6,999,331 * * 2/14/2006 * * Xiaohua Huang * ; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 1/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Patent Report) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 28, 2020 RECEIPT number #CAE200108533 $400.00 by Xiaohua Huang on 8/28/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Genesis Global Hardware, Inc. by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)Huang v. Genesis Global Hardware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis Global Hardware, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Jereige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?