Barnes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Barnes
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01730
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Attorney Sun, Jennifer added. (Sun, Jennifer)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Mary Alice Barnes. (Angelo, Joseph)
October 7, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 11/12/2020 hearing on the Motion to Dismiss #19 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to DISMISS by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sandler, Jonathan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Navient Solutions, LLC. (Whittemore, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Nelnet Servicing, LLC. (Sandler, Jonathan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Navient Solutions, LLC. Attorney Whittemore, Brian S. added.(Whittemore, Brian)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Micon, Samuel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to Respond to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Attorney Micon, Samuel A. added. (Micon, Samuel) Modified on 9/18/2020 (Huang, H).
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Not More Than 28 Days by Nelnet Servicing, LLC. Attorney Sandler, Jonathan Charles added. (Sandler, Jonathan)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER by TransUnion, LLC.(Miller, Debra)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/8/2020. Added attorney Debra A. Miller, PHV for TransUnion, LLC. (Coll, A)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by TransUnion, LLC for attorney Debra A. Miller to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9095899) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Booth, Eileen)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Nelnet Servicing, LLC served on 8/31/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 9/4/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/31/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 9/4/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/28/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 9/2/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: TransUnion, LLC served on 8/28/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 9/2/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Navient Solutions, LLC served on 8/28/2020. (Angelo, Joseph) Modified on 9/2/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, TransUnion, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Angelo* *Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.* *1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Suite 250* *Roseville, CA 95747*. (Benson, A.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Navient Solutions, LLC, Nelnet Servicing, LLC, TransUnion, LLC by Mary Alice Barnes. Attorney Angelo, Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9082817) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Sun
Represented By: Samuel A. Micon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Brian S. Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Sandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Debra A. Miller, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Alice Barnes
Represented By: Joseph Angelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?