Risley et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Risley and Debra Risley
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon LLC and Ethicon, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01744
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
2 Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/9/2020 ADDING Attorney Amanda L. Kurecian, PHV for Plaintiffs Bruce Risley and Debra Risley. (Kastilahn, A)
October 5, 2020 Filing 115 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for attorney Amanda L. Kurecian to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9160235) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/25/2020 ADDING Attorney Christopher A. Gomez, PHV for Plaintiffs. (Becknal, R)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/25/2020 ADDING Attorney Aaron L. Dunbar, PHV for Plaintiffs. (Becknal, R)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/25/2020 ADDING Attorney Lee B. Balefsky, PHV for Plaintiffs. (Becknal, R)
September 16, 2020 Filing 111 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/16/2020 GRANTING Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (ECF No. #110 ) and Attorney Priscilla E. Jimenez, NCAED is hereby TERMINATED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 16, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION to WITHDRAW Priscilla E. Jimenez , NCAED as ATTORNEY by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) Modified on 9/16/2020 (York, M).
September 15, 2020 Filing 109 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for attorney Christopher A. Gomez to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9116632) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter)
September 15, 2020 Filing 108 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for attorney Aaron L. Dunbar to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9116584) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter)
September 15, 2020 Filing 107 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for attorney Lee B. Balefsky to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $225, receipt number 0972-9116534). Attorney Kaufman, Peter Lawrence added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaufman, Peter) Modified on 9/15/2020 (York, M).
September 10, 2020 Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/2020: A review of the case shows that this matter was transferred from another district court. As is the practice of this Court, any dates pending prior to transfer are hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to re-notice any pending motions before Judge Troy L. Nunley on an appropriate law and motion date and submit on the briefs. The parties may also file and notice new motions if they wish to raise new issues. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 9, 2020 Filing 105 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Coll, A)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/9/2020 RECUSING District Judge John A. Mendez. Case reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1744-TLN-KJN. (Coll, A)
September 9, 2020 Filing 103 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
September 9, 2020 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to the 100 Minute Order Reassigning Case, this action is Randomly REASSIGNED to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. is no longer associated with this case. The case number on all future filed documents shall be: 2:20-cv-1744 JAM KJN. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Donati, J)
September 9, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-cv-00958-AWI, 1:20-cv-00044-AWI, 2:19-cv-02237-AWI, 1:20-cv-00818-AWI, 1:20-cv-00357-AWI, 2:20-cv-00354-AWI, 2:20-cv-01744-MCE, 2:20-cv-00787-AWI, 1:20-cv-00130-AWI, 1:20-cv-00129-AWI by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Attorney Benedict, Mollie Fleming added. (Benedict, Mollie)
September 9, 2020 Filing 100 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to the senior status of District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., the Clerk's Office is directed to reassign this case to another district judge for all further proceedings. (Deutsch, S)
September 9, 2020 Filing 99 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benedict, Mollie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 98 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Michael Bonasso, NCAED; James H. Keale, NCAED; Matthew D. Keenan, NCAED; Jon A. Strongman, NCAED; Michael A. Tanenbaum, NCAED; Robert Thomas Adams, PHV and Eric M. Anielak, NCAED terminated (O'Reilly, Theodore)
September 1, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Theodore O'Reilly on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. Attorney O'Reilly, Theodore added. (O'Reilly, Theodore)
September 1, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tarifa Belle Laddon on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. Attorney Laddon, Tarifa Belle added. (Laddon, Tarifa)
September 1, 2020 Filing 95 CLERK'S NOTICE DIRECTING Attorneys Andrew J. Cross, Lee B. Balefsky, PHV, Priscilla E. Jimenez, NCAED, Eric M. Anielak, NCAED, James H. Keale, NCAED, Jon A. Strongman, NCAED, Matthew D. Keenan, NCAED, Michael A. Tanenbaum, NCAED, Robert Thomas Adams, PHV, Michael Bonasso, NCAED, Lee Adair Floyd, Susan M. Robinson, NCAED, and William M. Gage, NCAED to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
September 1, 2020 Filing 94 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
September 1, 2020 Filing 93 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-05338.
August 24, 2020 Filing 92 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (7349) Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (7462) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8957) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9062) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 91 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (2425) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2428) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2535) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2625) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8947) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9055) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 90 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (3614) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3616) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3750) - Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3849) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8944) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9044) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Olga Ramm)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 89 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (2205) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2205) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2205) Part 3 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2206) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2287) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2287) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #7 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2297) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #8 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2552) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #9 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2552) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #10 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2552) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #11 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2825) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #12 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2826) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #13 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2942) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #14 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3053) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven MacLean, #15 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8996) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9033) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 88 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (8565) - Pls Mot to Exclude Bruce S. Kahn, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8566) - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce S. Kahn, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8643) - Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Bruce S. Kahn, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8660) - Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce S. Kahn, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8936) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot and Reply Briefs to Exclude Bruce S. Kahn, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9048) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce S. Kahn)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 87 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8987) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9017) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 86 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2931) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 85 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8988) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9014) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 84 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2200) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3626) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3626) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3630) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (3855) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8975) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9007) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 83 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 6 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 7 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 8 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 9 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 10 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 11 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 12 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 13 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 14 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 15 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 16 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 17 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 18 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 19 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 20 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1978) Part 21 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1982) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 82 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (4692) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (8973) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (9004) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 81 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2327 ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL 2327 ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 80 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, Tyree v. Bos. Sci. Corp ECF #216 - Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Spiegelberg, #2 Exhibit Tyree v. Bos. Sci. Corp ECF #275 - Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Stephen H. Spiegelberg, #3 Exhibit Tyree v. Bos. Sci. Corp ECF #473 - Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 79 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2326 ECF #8410 - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8084 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8413 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8425 - Notice of Adoption of Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8382 - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #6039 - Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk).[Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 78 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2326 ECF #8409 - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4815 - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8416 - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4968 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8425 - Notice of Adoption of Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #5038 - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #6038 - Memorandum Opinion and Order regarding Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 77 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2326 ECF #8404 - Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Stephen H. Spiegelberg, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #7004 - Pls Combined Mot and Memorandum of Law to Exclude Stephen H. Spiegelberg, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4827 - Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Spiegelberg, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8424 - Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Stephen Spiegelberg, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #7088 - Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Stephen H. Spiegelberg, #6 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4969 - Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Spiegelberg, #7 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #7160 - Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen H. Spiegelberg, #8 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #5031 - Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Spiegelberg, #9 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #6049 - Memorandum Opinion and Order regarding Steven Spiegelberg)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 76 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2326 ECF #8402 - Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot and Reply Briefs to Exclude Steven Little, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4825 Part 1 - Pls Mot and Memorandum of Law in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven R. Little, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4825 Part 2 - Pls Mot and Memorandum of Law in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven R. Little, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8423 - Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven R. Little, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4979 - Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven R. Little, #6 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #5034 - Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven R. Little, #7 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #6044 - Memorandum Opinion and Order regarding Steven R. Little)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 75 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2326 ECF #8396 - Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot and Reply Briefs to Exclude Ricardo Caraballo, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4831 - Pls Motion and Memorandum in Support of Pls Mot to Exclude Ricardo Caraballo, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8419 - Notice of Adoption of Boston Scientific Corporations Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Ricardo Caraballo, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4974 - Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Ricardo Caraballo, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #5029 - Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Ricardo Caraballo, #6 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF # 6042 - Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Ricardo Caraballo)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 74 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #73 CONTINUED, MDL 2326 ECF #8395 - Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot and Reply Briefs of Stephen Badylak, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4826 - Pls Mot and Memorandum of Law in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen F. Badylak, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #8418 - Notice of Adoption of Boston Scientific Corporations Resp of Stephen Badylak, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #4976 - Boston Scientific Corporations Resp to Pls Motion to Exclude Stephen F. Badylak, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #5033 - Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen F. Badylak, #6 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #6041 - Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Stephen F. Badylak)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/25/2020 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 73 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #184 - Stipulation for the Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information, #3 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #197 - Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit MDL 2326 ECF #200 - Boston Scientific Corporations Master Answer to Plaintiffs Master Long Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 8/24/2020 to add party filers) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 71 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #68 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 70 REPLY by Boston Scientific Corporation to #66 OPPOSITION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to #63 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Anielak, Eric) (Modified on 1/10/2020 to remove link to #48 pretrial order and add link to #66 opposition) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley in opposition to #59 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 68 OPPOSITION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to #59 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley in opposition to #63 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 66 OPPOSITION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to #63 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley in support of #64 OPPOSITION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to #62 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case Specific Opinions of Scott Bailey, M.D. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 64 OPPOSITION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to #62 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case Specific Opinions of Scott Bailey, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Anielak, Eric) (Modified on 12/24/2019 to remove incorrect party filer and add correct party filer) (mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Case Specific Opinions of Scott Bailey, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF ETHICON, LLC/ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Defendant Ethicon, LLC only is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/20/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #59 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) M [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 59 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 58 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice of Ethicon, LLC by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Sabrina Lolar on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Scott Bailey on 12/10/2019 at 3:00 p.m. SCT (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Wesley Hilger, M.D. on 12.02.2019 at 4:00 pm PST (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to testify at a Deposition to Wesley Hilger, M.D.)(Conour, Kenneth) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Scott Bailey on 12/10/2019 at 3:00 PM (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PRETRIAL ORDER # 346 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases) The Pretrial Order # 341 is AMENDED to correct a typographical error in Paragraph A (Scheduling Deadlines); the court has removed cases from the original Exhibit A that have since closed; the remaining provisions related to Wave 13 remain in effect and are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying #36 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Debra Risley, Bruce Risley to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/8/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 46 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Risley on August 12, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 45 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Debra Risley on August 12, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER (Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Case) The #39 Motion to Vacate the Dismissal and Reinstate the Complaint is GRANTED ; the #38 Order is VACATED; the Clerk is directed to reinstate the Boston Scientific Corporation defendants; the court ORDERS as follows: SCHEDULING DEADLINES. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 08/01/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 08/08/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 09/09/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 10/08/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/07/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/14/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 12/13/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 12/20/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 01/10/2020. Filing of Daubert motions due by 12/20/2020. Responses to Daubert motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 01/10/2020. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due by 11/4/2019, and any response is due by 11/18/2019. Any reply is due by 11/25/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no late than 11/5/2019, and are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 11/15/2019. The Clerk is directed to remove any existing wave, closed or inactive flags from this case and place the Ethicon Wave 13 flag. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/29/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants First Set of Interrogatories to Bruce Risley. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bruce Risley on August 12, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Debra Risley on August 12, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to Vacate the Dismissal and Reinstate the Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order and Writ)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #44 ORDER ENTERED ON 7/29/2019: ORDER granting #36 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Debra Risley, Bruce Risley to Dismiss Without Prejudice and terminate Boston Scientific Corporation from the docket of the Court, each party to bear its own costs; other defendants remain and plaintiff(s) will continue to prosecute their actions against them. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/24/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kab) (Modified on 7/29/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kew). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying as moot #26 MOTION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to Reinstate Case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/24/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 36 JOINT MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation, Debra Risley, Bruce Risley to Dismiss Without Prejudice. (Strongman, Jon) (Modified on 6/21/2019 to add party filers)(mk). [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Bruce Risley. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Deposition Notice of Debra Risley by Boston Scientific Corporation re: #32 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Debra Risley on July 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Debra Risley on July 19, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kenneth Paul Conour on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Conour, Kenneth) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lee Adair Floyd on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Floyd, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL ORDER # 208 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 7 Cases) The court ORDERS that the cases on Exhibits A and B are: (1) removed from the pending inactive docket; and (2) placed on the active docket. The court further ORDERS that: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; (3) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and every case listed on Exhibits A and B become subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and (4) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 7 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. Scheduling Deadlines. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 7 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 05/11/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 05/20/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 06/20/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due by 08/19/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants due by 09/18/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due by 09/25/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/25/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 11/01/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 11/15/2019. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/22/2019. Filing of Daubert motions due by 11/04/2019. Responses to Daubert motions due by 11/18/2019. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/25/2019. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 9/20/2019, and any response is due by 10/03/2019. Any reply is due by 10/10/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no later than 10/08/2019, the parties are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 10/18/2019. The parties' joint recommendation(s) shall identify cases where venue is in dispute. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/1/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 7 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley to Reinstate Case (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Priscilla E. Jimenez on behalf of Bruce Risley, Debra Risley. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lee B. Balefsky on behalf of Bruce Risley, Debra Risley. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2326 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2326 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER (Multi-Defendants): The court has been advised that the Plaintiff(s) and Defendants have reached a settlement. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and Defendants may submit a Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; otherwise the cases on Exhibit A will be dismissed without prejudice absent a request to the Court for an extension of the deadline. The Court will reinstate any case on the attached Exhibit A to the active docket if one of the parties, on motion, shows good cause for such reinstatement. Such motion shall be made within 5 days of rejection of the settlement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6078 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley; Andrew J. Cross is substituted as counsel of record in place of Michael Brandon Smith and C. Andrew Childers. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/22/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
February 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Andrew J. Cross on behalf of Bruce Risley, Debra Risley. (Cross, Andrew) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley. (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 24, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
July 25, 2013 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Ethicon, LLC. Ethicon, LLC served on 4/25/2013, answer due 5/16/2013. Summons served on Melanie McGrath. (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
May 6, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
May 1, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
April 19, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Eric M. Anielak on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Matthew D. Keenan on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keenan, Matthew) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Robert T. Adams on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Adams, Robert) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman/Partner on 03/22/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 3/19/2013, answer due 5/20/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
April 8, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 22, 2013 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (skh) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 21, 2013 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bruce Risley, Debra Risley for Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 19, 2013 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 40 (Defendant Fact Sheet) entered on 03/14/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Defendant Fact Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]
March 18, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-2286159. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from wvsd on 9/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Risley et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Theodore O'Reilly
Represented By: James H. Keale, NCAED
Represented By: Matthew D. Keenan, NCAED
Represented By: Michael Bonasso, NCAED
Represented By: Jon A. Strongman, NCAED
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum, NCAED
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak, NCAED
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Represented By: Robert Thomas Adams, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Conour
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, PHV
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Thomas, NCAED
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson, NCAED
Represented By: Lee Adair Floyd
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Conour
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak, NCAED
Represented By: William M. Gage, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, NCAED
Represented By: Christy D. Jones, PHV
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Risley
Represented By: Michael Brandon Smith
Represented By: C. Andrew Childers
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky, PHV
Represented By: Andrew J. Cross
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez, NCAED
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez, PHV
Represented By: Amanda L. Kurecian, PHV
Represented By: Aaron L. Dunbar, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Risley
Represented By: Michael Brandon Smith
Represented By: C. Andrew Childers
Represented By: Lee B. Balefsky, PHV
Represented By: Andrew J. Cross
Represented By: Priscilla E. Jimenez, NCAED
Represented By: Peter Lawrence Kaufman
Represented By: Christopher A. Gomez, PHV
Represented By: Amanda L. Kurecian, PHV
Represented By: Aaron L. Dunbar, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?