McCutcheon et al v. Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc.
Plaintiff: James McCutcheon and Brenda McCutcheon
Defendant: Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01811
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel J. Ashby on behalf of Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc.. Attorney Ashby, Daniel J. added. (Ashby, Daniel)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Annalisa Santamaria Zulueta on behalf of Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc.. Attorney Zulueta, Annalisa Santamaria added. (Zulueta, Annalisa)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Schick, Malcolm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Schick, Malcolm) Modified on 9/14/2020 (York, M).
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc. (Schick, Malcolm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00282365-CU-BC-GDS by Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9103567) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - OR SOS, #3 Exhibit C - Ntc Ack, #4 Exhibit D - Answer, #5 Declaration of Rick Ewing, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Schick, Malcolm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCutcheon et al v. Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCutcheon
Represented By: David N. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda McCutcheon
Represented By: David N. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outdoors RV Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm D. Schick
Represented By: Daniel J. Ashby
Represented By: Annalisa Santamaria Zulueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?