Piluyev et al v. Starbucks Corp., et al
Plaintiff: Liudmila Maftey and Tommy Piluyev
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Pactiv Packaging, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01812
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Davis, Whitney)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 STATEMENT of CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Miller, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 15 STATEMENT of CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Pactiv Packaging, Inc.. (Miller, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Miller, Robert)
November 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intent to Serve Subpoena-Sedgwick by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Whitney) Modified on 11/3/2020 (Zignago, K.).
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of intent to serve subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Davis, Whitney) Modified on 11/3/2020 (Zignago, K.).
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Pactiv Packaging, Inc. Attorney Miller, Robert James added.(Miller, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Starbucks Corporation. Attorney Miller, Robert James added.(Miller, Robert)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Pactiv Packaging, Inc. served on 9/25/2020. (Davis, Whitney) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Coll, A).
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Starbucks Corporation served on 9/25/2020. (Davis, Whitney) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Coll, A).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Starbucks Corporation served on 9/25/2020. (Davis, Whitney)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Pactiv Packaging, Inc. served on 9/25/2020. (Davis, Whitney)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tommy Piluyev.(Davis, Whitney)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Pactiv Packaging, Inc., Starbucks Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Whitney Aaron Davis* *K.W. Davis, Attorneys at Law* *641 Fulton Ave., Suite 110* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Benson, A.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all Plaintiffs. Attorney Davis, Whitney Aaron added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9103889) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Whitney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piluyev et al v. Starbucks Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liudmila Maftey
Represented By: Whitney Aaron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Piluyev
Represented By: Whitney Aaron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Robert James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pactiv Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?