Naiman v. ADT LLC
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Defendant: ADT LLC and Native Media LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01821
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/4/2021 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED(Reader, L)
May 31, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for DISMISSAL. by Sidney Naiman. Attorney Bacon, Adrian R. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bacon, Adrian) Modified on 6/1/2021 (Kaminski, H).
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Sidney Naiman. (Friedman, Todd)
May 11, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 18 Minute Order served on Native Media LLC. (Donati, J)
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to Local Rule 182(d), counsel may not withdraw and leave the client in propria persona without leave of the Court upon noticed motion and notice to the client and all other parties who have appeared. Accordingly, the Answer filed at ECF No. #17 is hereby STRICKEN. (Deutsch, S)
May 3, 2021 Filing 17 (STRICKEN per Minute Order (ECF No. 18)) ANSWER by Michael Austin for defendant Native Media, LLC. (Kastilahn, A) Modified on 5/11/2021 (Kastilahn, A). Modified on 5/11/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/23/21 ADDING Attorney Daniel S. Blynn, PHV for ADT LLC.(Kastilahn, A)
February 12, 2021 Filing 15 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by ADT LLC for attorney Daniel Scott Blynn to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9414678) (Rana, Amit)
January 29, 2021 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rana, Amit)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER by ADT LLC.(Rana, Amit)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/18/2020 DIRECTING ADT to respond to the #7 Amended Complaint by 1/29/2021. (Coll, A)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant ADT LLC. (Rana, Amit)
December 14, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Deadline for Defendant ADT LLC's Response To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by ADT LLC. (Rana, Amit)
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amit Rana on behalf of ADT LLC. Attorney Rana, Amit added. (Rana, Amit)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Native Media LLC * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard Street, Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Becknal, R)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADT LLC, Native Media LLC by Sidney Naiman.(Friedman, Todd)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: ADT LLC served on 10/13/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Friedman, Todd)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Friedman, Todd)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: ADT LLC served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Friedman, Todd)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *ADT LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Benson, A.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADT LLC by Sidney Naiman. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9105993) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naiman v. ADT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Amit Rana
Represented By: Daniel S. Blynn, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Native Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Naiman
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?