Freeman et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dena D. Ugalde, Mac E. Freeman, Aaron M. Freeman and Jason L. Freeman
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01867
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Morrison C England
3 Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/29/2020. Added attorney Ben C. Stellpflug for Aaron M. Freeman, Jason L. Freeman, Mac E. Freeman, Dena D. Ugalde.(Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/29/2020. Added attorney Stuart L. Goldenberg for Aaron M. Freeman, Jason L. Freeman, Mac E. Freeman, Dena D. Ugalde. (Sant Agata, S)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aaron M. Freeman, Jason L. Freeman, Mac E. Freeman, Dena D. Ugalde for attorney Benjamin Carl Stellpflug to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9209935) (Thornton, John)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Aaron M. Freeman, Jason L. Freeman, Mac E. Freeman, Dena D. Ugalde for attorney Stuart L. Goldenberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9209887) (Thornton, John)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): In light of the Court's Order Relating and Reassigning Cases, in the interest of efficiency and judicial economy, the Initial Scheduling Conferences in related cases Daryl Bond v. C R Bard, Inc., Case No. 1:20-cv-00444-DAD-BAM; Beverly Whitaker v. C R Bard, Inc., et al., Case No. 1:20-cv-01668-DAD-BAM; Tom Leonhart v. C R Bard Incorporated, et al., Case No. 1:20-cv-01677-DAD-BAM; Vandlean Mosier v. C R Bard Incorporated, et al., Case No. 2:20-cv-01767-DAD-BAM; Jennifer Pelayo v. C R Bard Incorporated, et al., Case No. 1:20-cv-01677-DAD-BAM; and Mac E. Freeman, et al. v. C.R. Bard, Inc., Case No. 2:20-cv-01867-DAD-BAM shall be held on the same date and time. Accordingly, an Initial SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is hereby SET for December 9, 2020, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. As part of their Rule 26 conference, the parties shall meet and confer regarding a uniform and coordinated proposed schedule for amendment of the pleadings, exchange of initial disclosures, fact discovery, expert discovery, and dispositive motion filing deadlines in the related cases. In light of the judicial emergency in this District, the Court will not set pretrial conference or trial dates. The parties should also discuss coordination, consolidation, and any other procedure to conserve judicial resources. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (see attached) one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The parties are encouraged to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference and may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3219139. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a Notice of Related Case pursuant to Local Rule 123 for any future related cases that are remanded or transferred to the Court. The parties are further directed to promptly address as appropriate any counsel identified on the docket who have not been terminated and are not admitted to practice before the Court. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/16/2020. (Valdez, E)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING AND REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/2020. Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:20-cv-01867-DAD-BAM. (Rivera, O)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:19-cv-01225-DAD-BAM by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Lewis, Shawtina)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lewis, Shawtina)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. (Lewis, Shawtina)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. Attorney Lewis, Shawtina Ferguson added.(Lewis, Shawtina)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John C. Thornton, III* *Andrews and Thornton* *4701 Von Karman Ave., Suite 300* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Benson, A.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants by all Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9120443) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thornton, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dena D. Ugalde
Represented By: John C. Thornton, III
Represented By: Ben C. Stellpflug
Represented By: Stuart L. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mac E. Freeman
Represented By: John C. Thornton, III
Represented By: Ben C. Stellpflug
Represented By: Stuart L. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron M. Freeman
Represented By: John C. Thornton, III
Represented By: Ben C. Stellpflug
Represented By: Stuart L. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Freeman
Represented By: John C. Thornton, III
Represented By: Ben C. Stellpflug
Represented By: Stuart L. Goldenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Shawtina Ferguson Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?