(PC)Dingle v. Tesluk et al
Plaintiff: David William Dingle
Defendant: Gregory C. Tesluk and D. Azevedo
Case Number: 2:2020cv01878
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David William Dingle signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/5/2020. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/5/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed ifp and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to amend within 60 days. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. The clerk shall send plaintiff a civil complaint form. (Yin, K)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, #7 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend with 1983 form served on David William Dingle. (Yin, K)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by David William Dingle. (Huang, H)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David William Dingle. (Coll, A)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for David William Dingle, CDCR# AC-7375 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K) Modified on 9/21/2020 (Yin, K).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *9/17/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 10/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Reader, L)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David William Dingle. (Reader, L)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by David William Dingle. (Reader, L)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Azevedo, Gregory C. Tesluk by David William Dingle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC)Dingle v. Tesluk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory C. Tesluk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Azevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David William Dingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?