(HC) Booker v. Lynch
Petitioner: James Booker
Respondent: J. Lynch
Case Number: 2:2020cv01894
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on James Booker. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 11/17/2020 ORDERING Clerk to assign a district judge and RECOMMENDING #9 Motion to Stay be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 30 days of service of the findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1894 TLN JDP (HC). (Henshaw, R)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to STAY by James Booker. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 10/19/2020 (Plummer, M).
October 6, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on James Booker. (Henshaw, R)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 10/5/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DISMISSING #1 Petition with leave to amend. Any amended petition should be filed within 30 days of this order's entry. (Henshaw, R)
October 1, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge, served on James Booker. (Donati, J)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Donati, J)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Becknal, R)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Booker. (Tupolo, A)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for James Booker, CDC AT-8795 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Henshaw, R)
September 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on James Booker. (Kaminski, H)
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/26/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Kaminski, H)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Booker. (Kaminski, H)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against J. Lynch by James Booker.(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Booker v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?