Pit River Tribe v. Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Pit River Tribe
Defendant: State of California and Gavin Newsom
Not Classified By Court: Bear River Band of Rohnerville Rancheria
Case Number: 2:2020cv01918
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:20-cv-01539-NONE-SKO, 1:20-cv-01147-AWI-SKO, 2:20-cv-01630-AWI-SKO, 2:20-cv-01585-AWI-SKO, 1:19-cv-00024-AWI-SKO, 1:20-cv-01318-AWI-JLT by Bear River Band of Rohnerville Rancheria. Attorney Forman, George added. (Forman, George)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER by State of California, Gavin Newsom. Attorney Muscat, Timothy M. added.(Muscat, Timothy)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:19-cv-00024-AWI SKO, 1:20-cv-1318-AWI JLT by Pit River Tribe. (Lawrence, Frank) Modified on 10/6/2020 (Reader, L).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *State of California, Gavin Newsom* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Frank Lawrence* *Law Office of Frank Lawrence* *578 Sutton Way, No. 246* *Grass Valley, CA 95945*. (Benson, A.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Pit River Tribe. Attorney Lawrence, Frank added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9138420) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawrence, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pit River Tribe v. Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pit River Tribe
Represented By: Frank Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Timothy M. Muscat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Represented By: Timothy M. Muscat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Bear River Band of Rohnerville Rancheria
Represented By: George Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?