McLanahan et al v. Green Day Power
Plaintiff: Cameron McLanahan and Michael McLanahan
Defendant: Green Day Power
Case Number: 2:2020cv01931
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
2 Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/12/20 ORDERING that Defendant Green Day Power shall have up to and including December 18, 2020, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant Green Day Power to Respond to Initial Complaint by Green Day Power. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order. (Muro, Raymond) Modified on 11/12/2020 (Kaminski, H).
October 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Green Day Power served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Kelly, PHV, Ryan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Green Day Power. (Muro, Raymond)
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend time to respond to initial complaint by Green Day Power. (Muro, Raymond) Modified on 10/21/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Raymond Joseph Muro on behalf of Green Day Power. Attorney Muro, Raymond Joseph added. (Muro, Raymond)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/2/2020 ORDERING attorney Ryan M. Kelly, PHV, added for Cameron McLanahan and Michael McLanahan. (Zignago, K.)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The Court having considered the equitable division and efficient and economical determination of court business, hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge *Edmund F. Brennan* to *Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson* for all further proceedings. As of October 1, 2020, Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson is reassigned to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California. (Reader, L)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Michael McLanahan for attorney Ryan M. Kelly to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9152909) (Attachments: #1 Character Reference Letters good standing letter)(Visher, S.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Green Day Power* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *S. Chandler Visher* *Law Offices of S. Chandler Visher* *44 Montgomery St., Suite 3830* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Benson, A.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michael McLanahan (Visher, S.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Michael McLanahan. Attorney Visher, S. Chandler added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9141363) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Visher, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLanahan et al v. Green Day Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron McLanahan
Represented By: S. Chandler Visher
Represented By: Ryan M. Kelly, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McLanahan
Represented By: S. Chandler Visher
Represented By: Ryan M. Kelly, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Day Power
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Muro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?