(PC) Colbourn v. Darnell et al
Plaintiff: Orrin Tyler Colbourn
Defendant: Carpenter, Jess Darnell, Michael Sears and Deal
Case Number: 2:2020cv01937
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE re REHEARING by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part I, #2 Exhibit Part II) (Tupolo, A)
November 17, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend served on Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Yin, K)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/17/2020 DISMISSING plaintiff's amended complaint, second amended complaint and third amended complaint. Plaintiff has 30 days to file a fourth amended complaint that complies with the court's 10/13/2020 order, the Civil Rights Act, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and the Local Rules of Practice. (Yin, K)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE re APPEAL by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Tupolo, A)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Orrin Tyler Colbourn re Proof of mailing. (Tupolo, A)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 THIRD AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Coll, A)
November 2, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Coll, A)
October 29, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Zignago, K.)
October 13, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Dismissing Case with Leave to Amend, #6 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Orrin Tyler Colbourn. Certified copy of #6 Order and ifp served on the Sheriff of Butte County. (Yin, K)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Jail Trust Account of Orrin Tyler Colbourn signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/13/2020. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Butte County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial) (Yin, K)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/13/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 motion to proceed ifp and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order. (Yin, K)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kastilahn, A)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT A by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Kastilahn, A)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE re FALSE IMPRISONMENT by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Tupolo, A)
September 29, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Huang, H)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Huang, H)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Huang, H)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Orrin Tyler Colbourn. (Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Colbourn v. Darnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orrin Tyler Colbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?