(PC) Thomas v. Sacramento Cnty. Sheriff's Dept. Transporation
Plaintiff: Jimmy Renay Thomas
Defendant: Sacramento Cnty. Sheriff's Dept. Transporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01951
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-01951-TLN AC P. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Jimmy Renay Thomas. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:20-cv-06565.
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jimmy Renay Thomas. (Jessen, A)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/29/20. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/30/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 9/30/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jimmy Renay Thomas. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 9/30/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sacramento Cnty. Sheriff's Dept. Transporation. Filed byJimmy Renay Thomas. Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 9/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Thomas v. Sacramento Cnty. Sheriff's Dept. Transporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Renay Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Cnty. Sheriff's Dept. Transporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?