Online Merchants Guild v. Maduros
Plaintiff: Online Merchants Guild
Defendant: Nicolas Maduros
Case Number: 2:2020cv01952
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/19/2020 EXTENDING defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint to 12/18/2020 and SETTING the following briefing schedule: Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendant's Motion to Dismiss due by 12/18/2020. Parties' Responses to the Motions due by 1/29/2021. Reply Briefs due by 2/26/2021. The noticed hearing date for both motions is 3/25/2021. (Coll, A)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT MOTION/STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER re Scheduling of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss by Nicolas Maduros. (Sapoznikow, Michael) Modified on 11/20/2020 (Benson, A.).
October 30, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to EXTEND Time for Defendant California Department of Tax & Fee Administration to Respond to Complaint by Nicolas Maduros. Attorney Sapoznikow, Michael added. (Sapoznikow, Michael) Modified on 11/2/2020 (Tupolo, A).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/6/2020. Added attorney Aaron K. Block, PHV for Online Merchants Guild. (Coll, A)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/6/2020 ADDING attorney Paul S. Rafelson, PHV for Online Merchants Guild. (Huang, H)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Aaron K. Block to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice)
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Aaron K. Block to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9149705) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Online Merchants Guild for attorney Paul S. Rafelson to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9149661) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing)(Fields, Candice)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Nicolas Maduros* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Candice L. Fields* *Candice Fields Law* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 750* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Online Merchants Guild (Fields, Candice)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nicolas Maduros by Online Merchants Guild. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9147270) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Treasurer Ma ltr to Governor Newsom, #2 Rafelson Dec., #3 Exhibit 3 - CDTFA Email to CNET, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amazon Tax Opinion, #5 Exhibit Amazon Email to Sellers, #6 Exhibit CDTFA Email 3.2018(1), #7 Exhibit CDTFA Correspondence, #8 Exhibit CDTFA Email 3.2018(2), #9 Exhibit CDTFA Email 2.2018, #10 Exhibit CDTFA Email 1.2019, #11 Freifelder Dec, #12 Rasbid Dec, #13 Kim Dec, #14 Wright Dec, #15 Norman Dec, #16 Exhibit Treasurer Ma Testimony, #17 Exhibit Wisconsin Notice, #18 Jenson Dec, #19 Exhibit Treasurer Ma ltr to Bosler)(Fields, Candice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Online Merchants Guild v. Maduros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Online Merchants Guild
Represented By: Candice L. Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Maduros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?