(SS) Swinhart v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gary Raymond Swinhart
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01955
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-1955-KJM-CKD (SS). (Zignago, K.)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Agrawal, Ashish)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Anderson, Donna)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/23/2020 ORDERING attorney Ashish A. Agrawal, PHV, added for Gary Raymond Swinhart. (Zignago, K.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Gary Raymond Swinhart. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. (Nyman, Melissa)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Gary Raymond Swinhart for attorney Ashish A. Agrawal to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9196759) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nyman, Melissa)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Zignago, K.)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melissa Markos Nyman* *Attorney at Law* *3009 Douglas Blvd., Suite 200* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Zignago, K.)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/14/2020 GRANTING plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Within fourteen days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the United States Marshal and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty days from the date of this order. The parties are hereby notified that, after service of the complaint, this action will be stayed pursuant to General Order Number 615, and there will be no scheduling order or deadlines in effect pending further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to issue the Consent/Decline forms only. Pursuant to General Order Number 615, no Briefing Schedule shall issue. (Zignago, K.)
September 30, 2020 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Benson, A.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Gary Raymond Swinhart. Attorney Nyman, Melissa Markos added (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nyman, Melissa)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Gary Raymond Swinhart. (Nyman, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Swinhart v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Donna Wade Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Raymond Swinhart
Represented By: Melissa Markos Nyman
Represented By: Ashish A. Agrawal, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?