Blackwell v. Commercial Refrigeration Specialists, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tim Blackwell
Defendant: Commercial Refrigeration Specialists, Inc. and Climate Pros, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01968
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of Defendant's Motion to Consolidate, ECF No. #17 . The Motion is noticed for hearing on 12/18/2020, which is not an available law and motion date. Accordingly, the court on its own motion RESETS the hearing for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM. Motion briefing deadlines are reset as provided by Local Rule 230. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 1/14/2021 is also RESET for 1/22/2021 at 10:00 AM, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. Both hearings will be held before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES by Climate Pros, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stelter, Judson)
November 3, 2020 Filing 16 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Climate Pros, LLC for attorney Michael K. Chropowicz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9222314) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnhill, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY by Climate Pros, LLC re #6 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Judson Stelter, #2 Exhibit 1)(Stelter, Judson) Modified on 11/3/2020 (Becknal, R).
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy L. Kennison for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #6 , is SUBMITTED without oral argument. The motion is submitted on the briefs, including the reply brief, if any, as provided by Local Rule 230(d). Accordingly, the Motion Hearing date of 11/6/2020 is VACATED. If the court determines that oral argument is needed, it will be scheduled at a later date. It is FURTHER ORDERED that in light of the pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #6 , the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 11/6/2020 is RESET for 1/14/2021 at 2:30 PM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of an updated joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Kennison, L)
October 23, 2020 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by Tim Blackwell to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephanie E. Yasuda,#2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Yasuda, Stephanie) Modified on 10/27/2020 (Kaminski, H).
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Tim Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Schedule of Pre-Trial Dates)(Yoon, Kenneth)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/14/2020. ADDED Attorney Judson Stelter for Climate Pros, LLC. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/15/2020. ADDED Attorney Ian A.J. Pitz for Climate Pros, LLC,. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Climate Pros, LLC for attorney Ian A. J. Pitz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9177500) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnhill, Michael)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Climate Pros, LLC for attorney Judson Stelter to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9177447) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnhill, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 2/11/2021 is ADVANCED to 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due fourteen (14) days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Climate Pros, LLC. Motion Hearing SET for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Barnhill, Michael) Modified on 10/9/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Climate Pros, LLC re #2 Civil New Case Documents for KJM, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Barnhill, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kenneth Yoon on behalf of Tim Blackwell. Attorney Yoon, Kenneth added. (Yoon, Kenneth)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Climate Pros, LLC. (Barnhill, Michael)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00282409 by all Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9153453)(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court of Sacramento Case Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnhill, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. Commercial Refrigeration Specialists, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Refrigeration Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Barnhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Climate Pros, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Barnhill
Represented By: Ian A.J. Pitz
Represented By: Judson Stelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Blackwell
Represented By: Kenneth Yoon
Represented By: Stephanie E. Yasuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?