(PC) Shaw v. Woods et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv01980
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/21/2021. Defendants shall file any motion to opt out of the Post-Screening ADR Project within 60 days. The parties shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the settlement conference in accordance with this order. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Yin, K)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/7/2021 DENYING 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/12/2020 ORDERING plaintiff has stated cognizable Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Shearer and Woods; and DISMISSING plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against defendant U.F.C.O., with leave to amend. Plaintiff may choose to proceed on his cognizable claims or to amend his complaint. Within 60 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached form indicating how he would like to proceed in this action. (Yin, K)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING 12 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion for Leave to Amend; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ECF No. 16 ); ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2020. CASE TRANSFERRRED to SACRAMENTO Division. New Case Number 2:20-cv-01980-DB (PC). Old Case Number 1:20-cv-01087-DAD-EPG (PC). (Rivera, O)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Shaw v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?