Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 173.87.173.243
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 173.87.173.243
Case Number: 2:2020cv02004
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: This case is DISMISSED, with prejudice, as provided by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and Plaintiff's Voluntary Dismissal, ECF No. #5 . Because this is the sole defendant, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED, and this case is CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* PA0002237302 * * Info Hash:87CF2435B2F211CB717C337C18373C83AC3CB7E7 * * Vixen * Copyright #2:* See attached list of total works infringed * * * * * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Copyright Report, #4 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2020: #5 Infringement list) (Benson, A.).
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT [REDACTED VERSION] against John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 173.87.173.243 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 173.87.173.243
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe infringer identified as using IP address 173.87.173.243
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?