Reynosa-Juarez v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Plaintiff: Sarah Reynosa-Juarez
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Case Number: 2:2020cv02052
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by relief courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Pursuant to the representation by counsel, the Court determined this case is settled (See ECF No. #30 ). In accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, counsel is to file dispositional documents or a status report on or before 1/27/22. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on any and all counsel as well as any party or parties who cause non-compliance with this order. Accordingly, all due dates and hearings set forth in this matter are VACATED. (Weisel, D)
October 28, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Dispositional Docs due by 12/10/2021. (Bifoss, Bailey)
October 6, 2021 Filing 29 REQUEST for Kaiser Foundation Hospitals to Supplement Factual Record on #24 Motion for Summary Judgment, Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bailey K. Bifoss, #2 Declaration of Molly Cassady)(Bifoss, Bailey) Modified on 10/8/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
August 6, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 8/12/2021 hearing on the Motion for Summary Judgment #24 is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (York, M)
August 5, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals re #24 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Evidence Submitted by Plaintiff, #2 Reply Separate Statement, #3 Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement)(Bifoss, Bailey)
July 29, 2021 Filing 26 OPPOSITION to #24 Motion for Summary Judgment by Sarah Reynosa-Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Opposition to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Statement of Disputed Facts, #3 Declaration of Kristi Rothschild, #4 Declaration of Sarah Reynosa)(Rothschild, Kristi) Modified on 7/30/2021 (Huang, H).
July 15, 2021 Filing 25 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals in re #24 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Bifoss, Bailey)
July 15, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #3 Declaration of Squyres, #4 Declaration of Tuggle, #5 Declaration of Cassady, #6 Declaration of McNaught, #7 Declaration of Yu, #8 Proposed Order)(Bifoss, Bailey)
July 15, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bailey K. Bifoss on behalf of Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. Attorney Bifoss, Bailey K. added. (Bifoss, Bailey)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/17/2021(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 13, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION and PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (McNaught, Andrew) Modified on 5/14/2021 (Kastilahn, A).
May 5, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/5/2021: The court is in receipt of the parties' stipulated protective order. (ECF No. #19 .) The court recognizes the parties' statement that they are not seeking a blanket protective order. However, the stipulation contains no information about the kinds of information to be protected, and so is in effect seeking a blanket order. See San Jose Mercury News, Inc. v. U.S. Dist. Court--N. Dist. (San Jose), 187 F.3d 1096, 1103 (9th Cir. 1999) ("[B]lanket orders are inherently subject to challenge and modification, as the party resisting disclosure generally has not made a particularized showing of good cause with respect to any individual document."). Thus, the court declines to approve the proposed order as written. The parties may resubmit the proposed order after addressing the requirements of Local Rule 141.1(c), including the need for a general description of the kinds of information sought to be protected. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Waldrop, A)
May 4, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for PROTECTIVE ORDER by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (McNaught, Andrew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (McNaught, Andrew)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorney Kristi D Rothschild, NCAED to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 VDRP) (Rivera, O)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-06419.
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, Dkt. No. #13 , this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/14/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
October 14, 2020 Remark: Case file electronically transferred to the Eastern District of California. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/24/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew More McNaught (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2020 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/18/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 9/17/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals.. (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/16/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2020 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/28/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Answer to Removal Complaint (See #1 Exhibit B) byKaiser Foundation Hospitals. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Foundation Hospitals for Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals identifying Corporate Parent Kaiser Foundation Hospitals for Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Joseph Rowley Notice of Appearance of Defendants' Counsel, Andrew M. McNaught (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Joseph Rowley (Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2020) [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20061214. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14932146). Filed byKaiser Foundation Hospitals. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration Declaration of Andrew M. McNaught, #4 Declaration Declaration of Paul Squyres, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Paul Squyres Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Paul Squyres Declaration, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rowley, Christian) (Filed on 9/11/2020) STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 10/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynosa-Juarez v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals
Represented By: Christian J. Rowley
Represented By: Andrew M. McNaught
Represented By: Bailey K. Bifoss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Reynosa-Juarez
Represented By: Kristi D Rothschild, NCAED
Represented By: Kristi D. Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?