USA v. Aziz Kamali, M.D., Inc. et al
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Aziz Kamali, M.D., Inc. and Azizulah Kamali
Case Number: 2:2020cv02156
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT by Petitioner to #10 Findings and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit O)(Belz, Matthew) Modified on 12/22/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/3/2020 RECOMMENDING that #1 Petition for Summary Enforcement be granted and that respondents be ordered to, within 10 days, comply with the CID by producing all documents responsive to Demands 1, 2, 4-8, 10-13, and 16; answering Interrogatories 3 and 4; providing complete answers to Interrogatories 1, 5-10, and 12; and producing a privilege log in accordance with Instructions 8 and 9. Referred to District Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/25/2020: Respondents have failed to file answering papers by the deadline set in the courts October 28, 2020 order (ECF No. #6 ). Accordingly, the December 2, 2020 hearing on the petition to enforce a civil investigative demand (ECF No. #6 ) is VACATED pursuant to Local Rules 230(c) and 230(g). The matter is taken under submission, with a written order to follow.(Text Only Entry)(Streeter, J)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Belz re #7 Reply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit N)(Belz, Matthew)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY by United States of America re #1 Petition. (Belz, Matthew)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/27/2020 ORDERING Kamali appear at a hearing on 12/2/2020 at 10:00 AM (via remote means) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, to SHOW CAUSE why an order should not be issued pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3733(j) directing Kamali to produce all documents responsive to Demands 1, 2, 4-8, 10-13, and 16; to answer Interrogatories 3 and 4; to provide complete answers to Interrogatories 1, 5-10, and 12; and to produce a privilege log in accordance with CID Instructions 8 and 9 of the CID, within seven (7) days of the issuance of such Order and to provide such documents and answers to interrogatories within ten (10) days of the issuance of such Order. On or before the close of business on 10/30/2020, the United States shall serve a copy of this Order, along with the declarations and memorandum of law submitted by the United States, on Kamali (i) by email and (ii) by Federal Express overnight delivery. Any answering papers by respondent Kamali shall be filed and served on or before 11/18/2020. Any reply papers by the United States shall be filed and served on or before 11/25/2020. (Zignago, K.)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Aziz Kamali, M.D., Inc., Azizulah Kamali* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew Robert Belz, GOVT* *U.S. Attorney's Office* *501 I Street, Suite 10-100* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Benson, A.)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Matthew R. Belz re #1 Petition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Belz, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Heather Sowa re #1 Petition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Belz, Matthew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for SUMMARY ENFORCEMENT of Civil Investigative Demand 2020-EDCA-11 by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Memorandum, #3 Proposed Order) (Belz, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Aziz Kamali, M.D., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Robert Belz, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aziz Kamali, M.D., Inc.
Represented By: C. Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Azizulah Kamali
Represented By: C. Keith Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?