(PS) Vi-Geant v. Vigeant
Plaintiff: Julie Vi-Geant
Defendant: Chris D. Vigeant
Case Number: 2:2020cv02173
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/23/2020 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Julie Vi-Geant. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Coll, A)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order [DISREGARD - Issued in error] PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; (Coll, A) Modified on 10/30/2020 (Coll, A).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Julie Vi-Geant. (Coll, A)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris D. Vigeant by Julie Vi-Geant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Vi-Geant v. Vigeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris D. Vigeant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Vi-Geant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?