Farley v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patrick B. Farley
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02223
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/30/2020: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/7/2021 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY by Patrick B. Farley re #7 Opposition to Motion, #5 Motion to Remand, #6 Proposed Order. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
December 24, 2020 Filing 7 OPPOSITION by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. to #5 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathy H. Gao)(Gao, Kathy) Modified on 12/28/2020 (Coll, A).
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion to Remand. (Bokhour, Mehrdad) Modified on 12/8/2020 (Coll, A).
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to REMAND by Patrick B. Farley. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Bokhour, Mehrdad)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for TLN. (Lesikar, Claire)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Claire M. Lesikar on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. Attorney Lesikar, Claire M. added. (Lesikar, Claire)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00285248 by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9227966) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Gao, Kathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farley v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kathy H. Gao
Represented By: Claire M. Lesikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick B. Farley
Represented By: Mehrdad Bokhour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?