(PS)Nailen v. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Douglas Nailen, Tongue Teaser and Michael Douglas Nailen Formerly doing business as Tongue Teaser's Int'l Seafood, Inc.
Defendant: Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02226
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPLY by Michael Douglas Nailen to #6 Answer to Complaint. (Tupolo, A)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Connie Lynn Benson for Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc., attorney John Schenck Williamson, III terminated (Benson, Connie)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc..(Williamson, John)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order RESERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons, #2 Civil New Case Documents served on Michael Douglas Nailen. (Becknal, R)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to FCI Safford, PO Box 9000, Safford, AZ 85548 by Michael Douglas Nailen, # 77981061. (Becknal, R)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, insufficient address: #3 Summons sent to Michael Douglas Nailen. Notice of Change of Address due by 2/8/2021. (Kastilahn, A)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.. Attorney Williamson, John Schenck added.(Williamson, John)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, insufficient address: #2 Civil New Case Documents sent to Michael Douglas Nailen. Notice of Change of Address due by 1/28/2021. (Zignago, K.)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Douglas Nailen* *N. 359th Avenue* *Tonopah, AZ 85354*. (Reader, L)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons served on Michael Douglas Nailen. (Reader, L)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Reader, L)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Civil New Case Documents for JAM served on Michael Douglas Nailen. (Reader, L)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc. by Michael Douglas Nailen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reader, L)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200110068 $400.00 Filing Fee fbo Michael Douglas Nailen by Samantha A. Levenson on 11/9/2020. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS)Nailen v. Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Douglas Nailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tongue Teaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Douglas Nailen Formerly doing business as Tongue Teaser's Int'l Seafood, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Koch & Sons Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Connie Lynn Benson
Represented By: John Schenck Williamson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?