(PC) Leen v. Cueva et al
Plaintiff: Dovie Dewdrop Leen
Defendant: DiTomas, CDCR Director, Cueva, Susan Benavidez, Eusebio Montejo, Ikegbu and Lori Austin
Case Number: 2:2020cv02231
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/30/2020 ADOPTING #8 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING #6 Motion to Compel, construed as a motion for preliminary injunction. (Zignago, K.)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Zignago, K.)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP served on the Director of CDCR pursuant to #11 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Yin, K)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Trust Account of Dovie Dewdrop Leen signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/29/2020.The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Yin, K)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Reader, L)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/23/20 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiffs complaint states, for screening purposes, a viable Eighth Amendment sexual assault claim and First Amendment retaliation claim against defendant Montejo. He may proceed with those claims and voluntarily dismiss all other claims and defendants or he may delay serving any defendant and file an amended complaint. If plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, it must be filed within sixty days of this orders entry. The Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff a prisoner complaint form with this order.. (Plummer, M)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, and prisoner civil rights complaint form served on Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Plummer, M)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Reader, L)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/1/2020 ORDERING Clerk to assign a district judge and RECOMMENDING #6 Motion to Compel, construed as a motion for preliminary injunction, be denied without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days of service of these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is: 2:20-cv-2231 JAM JDP (PC). (Henshaw, R)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Henshaw, R)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to COMPEL CMF to provide indigent envelopes and postage by Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Coll, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Coll, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coll, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Dovie Dewdrop Leen, CDCR# P-98976 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *11/6/2020*; Consent or Decline due by 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Kaminski, H)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL and EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Kaminski, H)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Kaminski, H)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dovie Dewdrop Leen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Leen v. Cueva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DiTomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Benavidez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eusebio Montejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikegbu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dovie Dewdrop Leen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?