(HC)Barrientos v. Ndoh
Petitioner: Edwin Pineda Barrientos
Respondent: Rosemary Ndoh
Case Number: 2:2020cv02234
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/21/20. Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2021 (Plummer, M)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 served on Tami Krenzin, Attorney General. (Plummer, M)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/21/20 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin, Attorney General)(Plummer, M)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Edwin Pineda Barrientos. (Plummer, M)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE200110785 $5.00 by Edwin Pineda Barrientos on 12/15/2020. (Becknal, R)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Kaminski, H)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/20 ORDERING Petitioner shall submit, within thirty days from the date of service of this order, a request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district. (Plummer, M)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, and prisoner IFP form served on Edwin Pineda Barrientos. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Reader, L)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Edwin Pineda Barrientos. (Reader, L)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Edwin Pineda Barrientos (Reader, L)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Rosemary Ndoh by Edwin Pineda Barrientos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 9-13, #2 Exhibit 14)(Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Barrientos v. Ndoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Pineda Barrientos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosemary Ndoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?