Torres v. American Water Company et al
Plaintiff: Hector Torres
Defendant: California American Water Company, American Water Company and International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Local Number 39
Case Number: 2:2020cv02241
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Defendants Time To Answer, Move Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint by American Water Company, California American Water Company. Attorney Adler, Matthew Jacob added. (Adler, Matthew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to American Water Company on 11/18/2020, Answer due 1/19/2021 (McGlamery, James)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to California American Water Company on 11/18/2020, Answer due 1/19/2021 (McGlamery, James)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Local Number 39 on 12/4/2020, Answer due 2/2/2021 (McGlamery, James)
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Provencher, Gary)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *American Water Company, California American Water Company, International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Local Number 39* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James E. McGlamery* *The Law Offices of James E. McGlamery* *775 University Ave.* *Sacramento, CA 95825*. (Benson, A.)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hector Torres (McGlamery, James)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Hector Torres. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9232546) (McGlamery, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. American Water Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California American Water Company
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Water Company
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers, Stationary Local Number 39
Represented By: Gary Phillip Provencher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Torres
Represented By: James E. McGlamery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?