Barbosa et al v. Shasta County et al
Plaintiff: K. B., T. B., Angelica Martinez-Vera, Kathleen Hood, Lupita Barbosa, Thomas Barbosa, Deceased and Thomas Barbosa
Defendant: Shasta County and Eric Magrini
Case Number: 2:2020cv02298
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION and JOINT REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by Eric Magrini, Shasta County. (O'Linn, Mildred) Modified on 1/7/2021 (Kaminski, H).
December 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Eric Magrini.(Carpenter, Lynn)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Eric Magrini, Shasta County. Attorney Carpenter, Lynn L. added. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carpenter, Lynn)
December 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Eric Magrini served on 12/7/2020; Shasta County served on 12/3/2020. (Haddad, Michael) Modified on 12/18/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 17, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER setting Briefing Schedule by Eric Magrini, Shasta County. Attorney O'Linn, Mildred K. added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Linn, Mildred) Modified on 12/18/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Teresa Denise Allen on behalf of K. B., T. B., Lupita Barbosa, Thomas Barbosa, Kathleen Hood, Angelica Martinez-Vera. Attorney Allen, Teresa Denise added. (Allen, Teresa)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julia Sherwin on behalf of K. B., T. B., Lupita Barbosa, Thomas Barbosa, Kathleen Hood, Angelica Martinez-Vera. Attorney Sherwin, Julia added. (Sherwin, Julia)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Eric Magrini, Shasta County* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Joseph Haddad* *Haddad & Sherwin, LLP* *505 Seventeenth Street* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Becknal, R)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Thomas Barbosa, Deceased, Lupita Barbosa, K.B., T.B., Angelica Martinez-Vera, and Kathleen Hood. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9250784) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haddad, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbosa et al v. Shasta County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shasta County
Represented By: Mildred K. O'Linn
Represented By: Lynn L. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Magrini
Represented By: Mildred K. O'Linn
Represented By: Lynn L. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. B.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Martinez-Vera
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hood
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupita Barbosa
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Barbosa, Deceased
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Barbosa
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?